SB158 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris

Revises provisions governing guardianships. (BDR 13-468)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)