SB165 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Oscarson

Makes various changes concerning the prevention and treatment of obesity. (BDR 40-791)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 257.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Mar 20, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 11,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 55     Amend. No. 746   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 55.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 746 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 257.

Effective July 1, 2017.