SB166 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Farley, Woodhouse, Spearman

Establishes a pilot program to survey pupils enrolled in public schools concerning the use and abuse of tobacco, alcohol, prescription drugs and controlled substances. (BDR S-795)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Exemption effective.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 21, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2017     05:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and re-refer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 241   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 241.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.