SB169 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris, Yeager

Revises provisions relating to sexual offenses. (BDR 15-472)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 375.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 03, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 431     Amend. No. 883   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 431.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 883.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 883 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 375.
  • Sections 1.7 and 21 to 24, inclusive, effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 2 to 9, inclusive, and 11 to 20, inclusive, effective on October 1, 2017. Sections 1.3 and 10 effective on January 1, 2020.