SB171 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert, Cancela, Ford, Harris, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Tolles

Requires certain pharmacies to post or provide written instructions for the safe disposal of unused drugs. (BDR 54-634)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 339.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 26, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 96     Amend. No. 726   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 96.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 726.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 726 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 339.
  • Effective October 1, 2017.