SB181 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Revises provisions governing certain alcohol and drug abuse programs. (BDR 16-513)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 27, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer   Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass, and re-refer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.