SB189 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to child care facilities. (BDR 38-61)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 587.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 01, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 29, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 12,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 88   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 88.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 587.

Effective June 14, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.