SB196 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford, Woodhouse, Spearman, Ratti, Farley, Atkinson, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Denis, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Frierson, Benitez-Thompson, Yeager, Carrillo, Elliot Anderson, Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Cohen, Daly, Diaz, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, Neal, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Swank, Thompson

Requires certain employers in private employment to provide paid sick leave to full-time employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-682)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
No further consideration.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 30, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 25,   Nay 15,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 184     Amend. No. 887   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 184.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 887.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, June 3, 2017, at 11:15 a.m.

Jun 03, 2017

  • No further consideration.