SB2 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 15, 2016.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Revises provisions relating to the surrender of a newborn child to a provider of emergency services. (BDR 38-39)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 49   

Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.

Effective October 1, 2017.