SB201 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 22, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Ratti, Ford, Atkinson, Spearman, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Manendo, Segerblom, Woodhouse, Araujo, Carrillo, Carlton, Neal, Cohen, Brooks, Flores, Krasner, Ohrenschall, Swank, Thompson, Yeager

Enacts provisions relating to conversion therapies. (BDR 54-301)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 04, 2017   Yea 15,   Nay 5,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 09, 2017   Yea 31,   Nay 8,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 644   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 123     Amend. No. 640   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 641   

Bill History

Feb 22, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 23, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 123.) To printer.

Apr 04, 2017

Apr 05, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Apr 28, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 640.) To printer.

May 08, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 09, 2017

  • Amendment No. 644 placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 8, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 640 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 11, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 17, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
  • Effective May 17, 2017 for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.