SB210 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer, Ford, Gansert

Provides for the licensure and regulation of anesthesiologist assistants. (BDR 54-155)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 08, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 22, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 128   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 128.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

Apr 21, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)