SB212 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert, Ratti, Woodhouse, Hammond, Parks, Atkinson, Cancela, Denis, Farley, Ford, Goicoechea, Hardy, Harris, Kieckhefer, Manendo, Roberson, Segerblom, Settelmeyer, Benitez-Thompson, Joiner, Tolles

Revises provisions governing the welfare of pupils. (BDR 34-674)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 561.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 02, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 02, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Education     May 29, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 31, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 496     Amend. No. 1018   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 496.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 31, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1018.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1018 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 561.

Effective July 1, 2018.