SB227 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 28, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Manendo, Parks, Ford, Spearman, Cancela, Denis, Ratti, Segerblom, Carlton, Oscarson, Titus

Revises provisions relating to nurses. (BDR 54-213)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
In Senate. To enrollment.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 27, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 02, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May 10, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 257     Amend. No. 668   

Bill History

Feb 28, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 01, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 257.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 668.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 17, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.