SB228 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 28, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to registry identification cards and letters of approval. (BDR 40-576)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 13, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 28, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 01, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)