SB233 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ratti, Cancela, Spearman, Cannizzaro, Woodhouse, Atkinson, Denis, Ford, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Benitez-Thompson, Frierson

Requires the State Plan for Medicaid and certain health insurance plans to provide certain benefits. (BDR 38-817)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 11, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2017     08:45 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 32,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 281     Amend. No. 693     Amend. No. 809     Amend. No. 913     Amend. No. 957   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 02, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 281.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 693 and 809.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.

May 19, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 913.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 913 and 957 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.

Effective January 1, 2018.