SB236 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 06, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Requires a license or permit issued by a local government to operate certain businesses in which the use of marijuana is allowed or to allow the use of marijuana at certain events. (BDR 20-43)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Assembly Taxation     May 23, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 270   

Bill History

Mar 06, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 270.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 27, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)