SB240 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris

Revises provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-939)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 21, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 134   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 134.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199.

Effective July 1, 2017.