SB25 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing the organization and functions of the Office of the Attorney General relating to domestic violence and the fictitious address program. (BDR 18-385)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 13, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 26, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 11, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 24, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 26, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 199   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 09, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass as amended.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382.

Effective July 1, 2017.