SB256 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2017.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises provisions relating to the Board of Dental Examiners of Nevada. (BDR 54-549)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 181.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 15, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 22, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 26, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 31, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 100     Amend. No. 401     Amend. No. 658   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 13, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 100.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 401.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 658.) To printer.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 19, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 658 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 181.

Effective May 26, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.