SB257 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Farley, Cannizzaro, Spearman, Ratti, Ford, Atkinson, Denis, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to the welfare of children. (BDR 38-662)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 87     Amend. No. 1140   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1140.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.

Effective July 1, 2017.