SB259 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo, Parks, Cannizzaro, Segerblom, Gustavson, Atkinson, Cancela, Denis, Farley, Ford, Gansert, Hammond, Hardy, Ratti, Spearman, Woodhouse, Carrillo

Revises provisions relating to driving under the influence of alcohol or a controlled substance. (BDR 43-606)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 564.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 30, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 06, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 05, 2017 08: 45 PM Conference report not available.


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 167     Amend. No. 948   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 26, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 948.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 29, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 948 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 948 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Appointment of Conference Committee rescinded.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
  • Action of refusal of concurrence rescinded.
  • Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 948.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 564.

Effective June 12, 2017 for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and on October 1, 2018, for all other purposes.