SB26 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Makes certain changes concerning governmental entities that contract with or invest in companies that boycott Israel. (BDR 27-418)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 304.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 20, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 19, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 198   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 198.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 304.

Effective June 2, 2017, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.