SB261 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Kieckhefer, Segerblom, Farley, Cancela, Denis, Ratti, Spearman, Woodhouse, Yeager, Brooks, Carlton, Bilbray-Axelrod, Cohen, Fumo, Swank

Revises provisions governing prescribing, dispensing and administering controlled substances designed to end the life of a patient. (BDR 40-17)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 749   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 749.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.