SB262 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 14, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Farley

Revises provisions concerning payments for treatment relating to mental illness or the abuse of alcohol or drugs. (BDR 57-455)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 377     Amend. No. 744   

Bill History

Mar 14, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 377.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 744 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.

Effective January 1, 2018.