SB27 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises the definition of the term “mental illness” for purposes of provisions relating to criminal procedure, mental health and intellectual disabilities. (BDR 39-133)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 97.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 56   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 56.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 97.

Effective July 1, 2017.