SB274 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 15, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ratti, Farley, Segerblom, Cancela, Parks, Cannizzaro, Denis, Manendo, Spearman, Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to sibling visitation in child welfare cases. (BDR 38-925)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Assembly Amendment No. 801 concurred in. To enrollment.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 158     Amend. No. 801   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 801.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 801 concurred in. To enrollment.