SB278 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris

Revises provisions relating to certain crimes committed against an older person or a vulnerable person. (BDR 15-501)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)