SB28 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Requires an annual review of certain rates paid by Medicaid in this State. (BDR 38-373)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 09, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Feb 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)