SB287 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert, Roberson, Cannizzaro, Parks, Atkinson, Cancela, Denis, Farley, Ford, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Hammond, Hardy, Harris, Manendo, Ratti, Settelmeyer, Spearman, Woodhouse, Benitez-Thompson, Tolles, Yeager

Revises provisions relating to the protection of children. (BDR 38-609)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 338.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 05, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     May 31, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 215     Amend. No. 298     Amend. No. 766   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 215.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 298.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Printer.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 766.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 766 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 338.

Effective July 1, 2017.