SB289 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Requires certain policies of health insurance to cover services provided by an out-of-network physician. (BDR 57-675)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.