SB291 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Harris, Atkinson, Gansert, Parks, Settelmeyer

Revises provisions relating to health records. (BDR 54-350)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 122     Amend. No. 888     Amend. No. 985   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 955   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 122.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 888.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 888 and 985 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.