SB292 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Exempts certain professionals who are licensed in another jurisdiction from provisions governing the practice of those professions for certain purposes relating to athletics. (BDR 54-319)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 22, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 19, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 27, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 729   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 24, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 27, 2017

Mar 29, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 729.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)