SB30 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions relating to the solicitation or acceptance of gifts by the Attorney General. (BDR 23-377)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 01, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)