SB302 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Farley, Spearman, Cancela, Yeager, Brooks

Provides an early start for recreational marijuana sales. (BDR 40-545)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 24, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Jun 03, 2017     08:20 PM          Minutes          Without recommendation

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 140   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

Apr 27, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development.

Apr 28, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 140.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

May 01, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Without recommendation.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)