SB305 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ratti, Ford, Segerblom, Manendo, Parks, Atkinson, Cancela, Spearman, Woodhouse

Revises provisions regarding certain proceedings concerning children. (BDR 38-926)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 242.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Reconsideration    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 156   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 156.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 242.

Effective October 1, 2017.