SB325 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cancela, Segerblom, Woodhouse, Spearman, Parks, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley

Revises provisions governing medical assistance to certain children. (BDR 38-941)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard   Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Jun 03, 2017     09:23 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1006   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1006.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 05, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593.

Effective July 1, 2017.