SB329 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Revises various provisions relating to marijuana concerning health and regulation. (BDR 40-361)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 13, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)