SB337 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Authorizes registered pharmacists to collect specimens and perform certain laboratory tests. (BDR 54-945)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 360.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 26, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 730   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 730.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 730 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 360.

Effective July 1, 2017.