SB344 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Farley, Segerblom

Revises various provisions relating to the labeling, packaging and advertising of marijuana. (BDR 40-451)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 539.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 10, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 37,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 272     Amend. No. 881     Amend. No. 1114   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: May 19, 2017.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in.
  • Action reconsidered.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 539.
  • Sections 3 to 8, inclusive, and 9 effective on July 1, 2017. Section 1 effective October 1, 2017. Section 2 effective January 1, 2020.