SB346 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Clarifies provisions governing the prescribing, dispensing and administering of drugs. (BDR 54-676)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 185   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 185.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.