SB364 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Segerblom, Manendo, Spearman, Ratti, Woodhouse

Revises provisions governing the trapping of certain animals. (BDR 45-107)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 04, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 16, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 14,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 367     Amend. No. 836     Amend. No. 933   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 367.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 933.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 836 and 933 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.

Effective July 1, 2017.