SB366 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cancela

Makes various changes relating to Medicaid. (BDR 38-927)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 284     Amend. No. 714   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 284.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 714.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 714 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.