SB371 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea

Establishes provisions governing the care of an animal which has been impounded. (BDR 14-153)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 04, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 16, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 234     Amend. No. 838   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

Apr 21, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 838 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.

Effective June 1, 2017.