SB374 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Spearman

Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana or industrial hemp. (BDR 40-185)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 13, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 278     Amend. No. 625     Amend. No. 713   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 278.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 625.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Printer.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 713.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 24, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 713 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.