SB378 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to controlled substances. (BDR 14-559)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)