SB388 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert, Hardy, Gustavson, Harris, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Goicoechea, Kieckhefer, Ratti, Segerblom, Settelmeyer, Spearman, Woodhouse, Edwards, Ellison, Krasner, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Swank, Tolles, Wheeler

Revises provisions relating to persons who provide personal care in the home. (BDR 40-613)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 298.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 298.

Effective July 1, 2017.