SB396 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman, Segerblom, Parks, Atkinson, Cancela, Denis, Farley, Ford, Ratti, Woodhouse, Brooks, Carrillo

Revises provisions relating to industrial hemp. (BDR 49-53)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 259.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 04, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 13, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 34,   Nay 5,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 330   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 330.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 259.

Effective July 1, 2017. Sections 13 and 14 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.