SB398 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Establishes various provisions relating to the use of blockchain technology. (BDR 59-158)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 30, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule   Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 217     Amend. No. 681   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 217.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 681.) To printer.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 681 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.

Effective June 5, 2017.