SB40 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to the registration of child custody determinations from outside Nevada. (BDR 11-401)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 51.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 01, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 30   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 30.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 51.
  • This act becomes effective on July 1, 2017.