SB404 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Segerblom, Spearman, Woodhouse, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Ford, Goicoechea, Manendo, Ratti, Ohrenschall, Sprinkle, Joiner, Carlton, Bustamante Adams

Revises provisions relating to health insurance coverage of certain cancer treatment drugs. (BDR 57-467)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)